U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-30103-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 27, 2025: [Extend]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 21, 2025: [Consent]
  • April 21, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 21, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • April 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 18, 2025: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 18, 2025: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 18, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 18, 2025: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • April 17, 2025: [Jury Questionnaires]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Reassigning Case & Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Brief]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.