U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-50140-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Boyd
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Text Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • May 08, 2025: [Evidentiary Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 28, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 15, 2025: [Extend]
  • April 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Suppress]
  • April 14, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Expert Witness]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.