U.S. District Court for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-mj-00065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cruz-Martinez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Terminate Magistrate Case]
  • April 07, 2025: [Request re Evidence]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 04, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 04, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 04, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • April 02, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.