U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:05-cr-30122-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brave Bird
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 09, 2025: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 24, 2025: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 22, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • April 09, 2025: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 09, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.