U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-50051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Packed
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 06, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 02, 2025: [Consent]
  • May 02, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 28, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 28, 2025: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 08, 2025: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 04, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 04, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 04, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 04, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 04, 2025: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 04, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 04, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • April 04, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.