U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-40066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lagos-Acosta
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 22, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 08, 2025: [Request re Evidence]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 08, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 08, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 04, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.