U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-40058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hoffman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 08, 2025: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 06, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 23, 2025: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 21, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 21, 2025: [Request re Evidence]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 21, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 21, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 21, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • April 04, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.