U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-10006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pernillo-Arana
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 02, 2025: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • May 01, 2025: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • May 01, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • May 01, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 29, 2025: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 29, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 28, 2025: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • April 28, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Request re Evidence]
  • April 07, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 07, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 07, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 07, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • April 07, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 07, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.