U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-10030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 12, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 12, 2025: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 12, 2025: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 12, 2025: [Supplement]
  • May 12, 2025: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • May 09, 2025: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • May 08, 2025: [Response]
  • May 08, 2025: [Jury Questionnaires]
  • May 08, 2025: [Jury List]
  • May 08, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • May 07, 2025: [Supplement]
  • May 07, 2025: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • May 06, 2025: [Response]
  • May 06, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 06, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • May 06, 2025: [In Limine]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice]
  • May 05, 2025: [Transcript OR Ex Parte Transcript]
  • May 05, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 05, 2025: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 05, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 02, 2025: [Transcript OR Ex Parte Transcript]
  • May 01, 2025: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • May 01, 2025: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • May 01, 2025: [Exhibit List]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 29, 2025: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 16, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Response]
  • April 10, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Suppress]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.