U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-30041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Addison
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Sealed Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • May 06, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • May 05, 2025: [Competency Hearing]
  • May 01, 2025: [Witness List]
  • May 01, 2025: [Exhibit List (attorney use)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Exhibit List (attorney use)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Witness List]
  • April 15, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.