U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-50060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rouillard et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
  • May 02, 2025: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 02, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Request re Evidence]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 23, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 23, 2025: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 23, 2025: [Waiver]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 18, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 18, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • April 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 17, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 16, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • April 16, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Redacted Charging Document]
  • April 16, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.