U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-50048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Belone
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 13, 2025: [Suppress]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 06, 2025: [Suppress]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • April 29, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • April 23, 2025: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • April 17, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 16, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 16, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 16, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [Request re Evidence]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 16, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 16, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • April 16, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.