U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-50062-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Black Bear et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 24, 2025: [Request]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 23, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 23, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Discovery]
  • April 23, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • April 22, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 18, 2025: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • April 18, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 18, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 18, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 18, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 17, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 17, 2025: [Redacted Charging Document]
  • April 17, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • April 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 16, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • April 16, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 16, 2025: [Redacted Charging Document]
  • April 16, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 15, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.