U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-30018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fischbach
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 25, 2025: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 24, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 24, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • April 18, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 18, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 18, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 18, 2025: [Request]
  • April 17, 2025: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 17, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 17, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • April 16, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.