U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-40070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lathrop
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 06, 2025: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Request re Evidence]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • April 29, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 29, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 29, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 29, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 24, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 18, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 18, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.