U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-50068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cruz-Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 30, 2025: [Consent]
  • April 30, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 18, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 18, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • April 18, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.