U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-50074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lester
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Request re Evidence]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 25, 2025: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 25, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 25, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 21, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • April 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.