U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-30027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cook et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Request]
  • April 30, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 30, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • April 23, 2025: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 21, 2025: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • April 21, 2025: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Continue Detention Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Oral Motion to Continue Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 21, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 19, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Indictment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 17, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.