U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-50071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bagola
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Invocation of Rights]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 25, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Request re Evidence]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 24, 2025: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 23, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 23, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 23, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • April 22, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.