U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-50026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flying Horse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 05, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 05, 2025: [Consent]
  • May 05, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 24, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 24, 2025: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Expert Witness]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.