U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-50073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cortier
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • May 05, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 01, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 28, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 28, 2025: [Request re Evidence]
  • April 28, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 28, 2025: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • April 25, 2025: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 25, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 25, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 25, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • April 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.