U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-10009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Young Hawk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 01, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 01, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • May 01, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • May 01, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 01, 2025: [Bail Report]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Request]
  • April 28, 2025: [Request]
  • April 25, 2025: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 24, 2025: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Continue Detention Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 24, 2025: [Oral Motion to Continue Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • April 24, 2025: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.