open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Texas

TEXAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Texas
    Case Number:7:19-cr-01042-1
    Party Name:USA v. Montoya-Narvaez
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of No Objections to PSR (Sealed)]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Re-Arraignment ADI - McAllen]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [PSI and Disclosure & Sentencing Dates (FORM)]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Document]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order (FORM)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery Order - FORM]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1675304
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =