open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Texas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Texas
    Case Number:3:19-cr-01764-2
    Party Name:USA v. Rodriguez-Sarmiento
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Presentence Investigation Report Filed]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Disclosure of PSR to Attorneys]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Sentencing]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Accepting Findings of Fact (Plea)]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Dismissal - Material Witness]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Findings of Fact on Plea]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rearraignment]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent to Plea before Magistrate (Rule 11)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Indictment]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Addendum to Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Personal Data Sheet (SEALED)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [To be Referred to EP Mag Judge]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1036105
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =