open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Texas

TEXAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Texas
    Case Number:2:19-cr-00634-1
    Party Name:USA v. Valdivia-Moran
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons (Sealed)]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment (AO 245)]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Resetting (FORM, noticing) - Criminal]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent to Magistrate to Plea]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Findings and Recommendation on Plea of Guilty (FORM)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Re-Arraignment]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [PSI and Disclosure & Sentencing Dates (FORM) - Expanded]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Setting/Resetting (FORM, noticing) - Criminal]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order/Waiver (FORM)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - ADI]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1677117
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =