open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Texas

TEXAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Texas
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00278
    Party Name:PerdiemCo LLC v. Trimble Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Staying Case]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Counterclaim]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Counterclaim]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Change Venue]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disqualify Counsel]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Error by Attorney]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Magistrate Availability]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?191401
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =