open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Texas

TEXAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Texas
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00350
    Party Name:Parrott v. Director, TDCJ-CID
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?191411
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =