open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Texas

TEXAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Texas
    Case Number:4:19-cv-00604
    Party Name:Gonsior v. At Home Group Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:August 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Magistrate Availability]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?191409
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =