open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Texas

TEXAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Texas
    Case Number:5:19-cr-00569-1
    Party Name:USA v. Azcona Mejia
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Presentence Investigation Report Filed]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Disclosure of PSR to Attorneys]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Accepting Findings of Fact (Plea)]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Findings of Fact on Plea]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rearraignment]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Rearraignment]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Referral on Plea (Rule 11)]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Concerning Discovery & Pre-Trial Motions]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Accepting Waiver of Appearance at Arraignment]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Appearance]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1048911
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =