open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Texas

TEXAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Texas
    Case Number:4:20-cr-00025-1
    Party Name:USA v. Bellamy
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order - Pretrial Discovery & Inspection]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest ]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [AO 257 Filed]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appointment]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:January 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan]
    Date Published:December 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Counterclaim]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Claim]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Crossclaim]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Interested Parties]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of Service Executed]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Crossclaim]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Counterclaim]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued/Not Issued]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons - Request for Issuance]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1699557
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =