open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Texas

TEXAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Texas
    Case Number:4:19-cv-00657
    Party Name:Cherry v. Unidentified Defendants
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order for Initial Partial Filing Fee]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Magistrate Availability]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?192072
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =