open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Texas

TEXAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Texas
    Case Number:6:19-cr-00269-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rios-Gisar
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Presentence Investigation Report Filed]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Disclosure of PSR to Attorneys]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Sentencing]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Accepting Findings of Fact (Plea)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rearraignment]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Findings of Fact on Plea]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent to Plea before Magistrate (Rule 11)]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Referral on Plea (Rule 11)]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Factual Basis]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Accepting Waiver of Appearance at Arraignment]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting District Court Arraignment]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Counsel]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (SEALED)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Personal Data Sheet (SEALED)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1056806
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =