open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Texas

TEXAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Texas
    Case Number:6:19-cr-00268-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rico, Jr.
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Attorney]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Hearing]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Status Conference]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Factual Basis]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Concerning Courtroom Decorum]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Appearance at Arraignment - Plea Not Guilty]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Counsel]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (SEALED)]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Personal Data Sheet (SEALED)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1056804
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =