open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Texas

TEXAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Texas
    Case Number:19-52207-rbk
    Party Name:Miguel Antonio Peche
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Viegelahn, Mary K [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Viegelahn, Mary K [13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (batch) (PDF)]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Viegelahn, Mary K [BK-Regarding Matter (pdf)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Viegelahn, Mary K [Attorney's Fees On Chapter 13 Case]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Viegelahn, Mary K [13 Order Denying 13 Plan and Dismissing Case (PDF)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Viegelahn, Mary K [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Viegelahn, Mary K [Proof of Claim Attachment 3001(c)(1)(d)]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Viegelahn, Mary K [Notice of Claim by Debtor/Trustee]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Viegelahn, Mary K [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income B122C-1]
    Date Published:November 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Viegelahn, Mary K [13 Confirmation Hearing Continued/Reset (Batch) (F)]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Viegelahn, Mary K [Amended Schedules (without D, E/F)]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Viegelahn, Mary K [Amended Petition]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Viegelahn, Mary K [13 Trustee's 341 Proceeding Memo (NO PDF) (NO NTC)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Viegelahn, Mary K [13 Trustee's 341 Proceeding Memo (Austin, El Paso, San Antonio, Midland)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Viegelahn, Mary K [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Viegelahn, Mary K [Notice Request (batch)]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Viegelahn, Mary K [Notice of Appearance and Request]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Viegelahn, Mary K [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:September 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Viegelahn, Mary K [Request for Notice-Interested Parties (pdf)]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Viegelahn, Mary K [Redact]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Viegelahn, Mary K [13 341 Meeting of Creditors (batch) (F) (NO PDF)]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Viegelahn, Mary K [Redact (25.00 Fee Per Case)]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Viegelahn, Mary K [Declaration for Electronic Filing (Restricted Document)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Viegelahn, Mary K [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Viegelahn, Mary K [ICC-Fee Paid]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Viegelahn, Mary K [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Viegelahn, Mary K [Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling-First Debtor Only]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Viegelahn, Mary K [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txwb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?339422
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =