open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Texas

TEXAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Texas
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00367
    Party Name:Hahn v. Credit Systems International Inc et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:May 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Magistrate Availability]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?193513
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =