open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Texas

TEXAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Texas
    Case Number:4:19-cv-00812
    Party Name:Cunningham v. Vehicle Protection Specialists, LLC aka Vehicle Service Center et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Fee Received]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Magistrate Availability]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?193512
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =