open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Texas

TEXAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Texas
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00366
    Party Name:Syncmold Enterprise Corp. v. Taizhou Stronkin Electronics Co., Ltd.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Sealed Patent Motion]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sealed Patent Motion]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Magistrate Availability]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?193509
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =