open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Texas

TEXAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Texas
    Case Number:4:19-cr-00821-1
    Party Name:USA v. Thomas-Harris
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:May 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Setting (noticing) - Criminal]
    Date Published:April 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:April 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:April 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral Order]
    Date Published:April 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release from Custody ]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suppress]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Resetting (FORM, noticing) - Criminal]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Criminal]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Hearing Minutes and Order]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue - Cr]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Services Report (Sealed)]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order (FORM)]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Federal Public Defender]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appointing Counsel (FORM)]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention (FORM)]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Houston Only)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Issuance]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1721546
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =