open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Texas

TEXAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Texas
    Case Number:5:19-cv-00161
    Party Name:Young et al v. Braum's, Inc
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency]
    Date Published:June 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:June 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:May 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Discovery Disclosure]
    Date Published:May 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sever]
    Date Published:May 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mediation Packet Mailed]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Mediator]
    Date Published:April 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:April 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Demand]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Magistrate Availability]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?194055
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =