open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Texas

TEXAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Texas
    Case Number:4:09-cr-00202-1
    Party Name:USA v. Lemieux
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:April 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Return of Service Executed]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Deficiency]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Non-Motion]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Hearing]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?119298
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =