open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Texas

TEXAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Texas
    Case Number:6:20-cv-00072
    Party Name:Spence v. Director, TDCJ-CID
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
    Date Published:March 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Magistrate Availability]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.txed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?195534
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =