open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Texas

TEXAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Texas
    Case Number:20-32133-mvl7
    Party Name:Ronald Dean Stanley and Deborah Elaine Durham Stanley
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cunningham, James W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cunningham, James W. [Financial management course (batch)]
    Date Published:August 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cunningham, James W. [Notice of deficiency financial management course]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cunningham, James W. [BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cunningham, James W. [BNC certificate of mailing]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cunningham, James W. [Notice of deficiency]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cunningham, James W. [Employee income records]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cunningham, James W. [Statement of financial affairs]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cunningham, James W. [Schedules]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cunningham, James W. [none]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cunningham, James W. [Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cunningham, James W. [Meeting of creditors 7 no asset - AutoAssign]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cunningham, James W. [Voluntary petition chapter 7 (attorney filer)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.txnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?487487
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =