open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Texas

TEXAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Texas
    Case Number:20-34010
    Party Name:Andrea Lynn Hendon
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sommers, Ronald J [Notice of Proposed Abandonment (FORMS)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sommers, Ronald J [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sommers, Ronald J [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:September 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sommers, Ronald J [Pay Advices or Certification]
    Date Published:September 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sommers, Ronald J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sommers, Ronald J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sommers, Ronald J [Certificate of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sommers, Ronald J [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sommers, Ronald J [Notice of Credit Counseling (FORMS)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sommers, Ronald J [Initial Order for Prosecution (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sommers, Ronald J [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sommers, Ronald J [Order: Possible Future Dismissal of Case]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sommers, Ronald J [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Creditors)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sommers, Ronald J [none]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sommers, Ronald J [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) [system event]]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) [system event]]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.txsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?444395
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =