open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Texas

TEXAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Texas
    Case Number:2:19-cr-00333-1
    Party Name:USA v. Roslund
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Services Report (Sealed)]
    Date Published:September 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt of Bond Payment]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention and Arraignment]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order/Waiver (FORM)]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Federal Public Defender]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appointing Public Defender (FORM)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Unsealed]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.txsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1661703
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =