U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 15-27442
  • Case Name: Aaron T Rennert
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2015
  • December 09, 2015: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Zeman, tr Sally J. [Close Bankruptcy Case (Chapter 7,12 &13)]
November, 2015
  • November 05, 2015: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Zeman, tr Sally J. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final) (FEE)]
October, 2015
  • October 31, 2015: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Zeman, tr Sally J. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
  • October 28, 2015: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Zeman, tr Sally J. [Certificate of Service Re: Miscellaneous Pleadings]
  • October 28, 2015: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Zeman, tr Sally J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 26, 2015: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Zeman, tr Sally J. [Clerk's Notice of Fees Due (Dismissed only)]
  • October 26, 2015: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Zeman, tr Sally J. [Dismissing Case (Administrative) (order)]
  • October 21, 2015: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Zeman, tr Sally J. [Motion to Continue Chapter 13 Plan Confirmation Hearing]
  • October 16, 2015: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Zeman, tr Sally J. [Response]
  • October 05, 2015: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Zeman, tr Sally J. [Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Request for Notice (No Image)]
September, 2015
  • September 04, 2015: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Statement of Financial Affairs and Schedules]
  • September 04, 2015: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • September 04, 2015: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • September 04, 2015: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 22C-1]
  • September 01, 2015: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Anderson, tr Kevin R. [Declaration/Affidavit Re: Tax Returns]
August, 2015
  • August 14, 2015: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Anderson, tr Kevin R. [List of Creditors (Matrix) Upload]
  • August 11, 2015: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Anderson, tr Kevin R. [Clerk's Notice of Possible Previous Discharge]
  • August 11, 2015: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Anderson, tr Kevin R. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (order)]
  • August 11, 2015: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Anderson, tr Kevin R. [Deficiencies (13)]
  • August 10, 2015: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Anderson, tr Kevin R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.