Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00003-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rouse
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Unseal Case]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Protective Order]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.utd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?113121
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =