open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah
    Case Number:4:19-cv-00005
    Party Name:Garrett v. I-Flow Corporation et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:April 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.utd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?113051
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =