open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Utah

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Utah
    Case Number:19-24276
    Party Name:Gabriela Munguia
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Extend Time to Oppose Discharge (Motion)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Order]
    Date Published:September 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Order (generic) (order)]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Pending Order]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Joint Administration (Motion)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Withdrawal of Document (no image)]
    Date Published:September 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Motion to Convert to Chapter 13]
    Date Published:September 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Objection]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Clerk's Notice to File Financial Management Education Certificate (423)]
    Date Published:September 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Dismiss Case (Motion)]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [*Notice and Opportunity for Hearing]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Chapter 13/7 Trustee's Objection to Claim of Exemption]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final) (FEE)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee (IFP) (order)]
    Date Published:July 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Payment Advices/Evidence of Payment and/or Certification]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Addendum to Application for Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee (IFP)]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [BNC Certificate of Service Re: Deficiency Notice]
    Date Published:June 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Certificate of Service Re: Miscellaneous Pleadings]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Deficiencies (7)]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [List of Creditors (Matrix) Upload]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Declaration by BPP - Form 119]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Statement of Financial Affairs and Schedules]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Application) (IFP)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Debtor's Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Credit Counseling Agency Briefing Certificate (Prefiling)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rupp, tr Stephen W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.utb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?431694
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =