open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

UTAH PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah
    Case Number:2:19-cr-00297-1
    Party Name:USA v. Vidal-Hernandez
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release Order]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Fast Track Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.utd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?116095
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =