open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Utah

UTAH PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Utah
    Case Number:19-26661
    Party Name:Dieudonne Mulamba Kabulayi
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Order]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (order)]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Notice of Endorsement (NO IMAGE)]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Pending Order]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Minute Entry.Confirmation Hearing Stricken]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Chapter 13 Trustee's Continuing Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Trustee's Withdrawal of Document (NO IMAGE)]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Amended Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Chapter 13 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss (Generic)]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Certificate of Service Re: Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [PayGov Receipt of Fee Due]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Notice of Debtors Prior Filings]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Declaration/Affidavit Re: Tax Returns]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [List of Creditors (Matrix) Upload]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Statement of Financial Affairs and Schedules]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Credit Counseling Agency Briefing Certificate (Prefiling)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (FEE)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.utb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?434127
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =